+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 16102077D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB385E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102077D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2016: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor