+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (67)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1256)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 1256 (effective 7/1/20)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB384ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: (61-Y 29-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (61-Y 29-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N)
On April 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB384ER)
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 34-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (58-Y 34-N)
On March 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
- Second conferees appointed by Senate
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
- Amended by conference committee
- First Conference substitute printed 20109655D-S4
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- Second conferees appointed by House
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate requested second conference committee (32-Y 7-N)
On March 7, 2020 in the House:
- House acceded to request for second conference committee
- Delegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Conference substitute printed 20109887D-S5
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: McPike, Mason, Pillion
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Sickles, Simon, Morefield
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N)
- Passed House with substitute (59-Y 38-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB384H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108617D-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20108617D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute rejected 20106308D-S1
- Floor substitute printed 20107871D-S3 (McPike)
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB384S3
- Committee substitute rejected 20107714D-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to (24-Y 13-N)
- Title replaced 20107871D-S3
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20107714D-S2
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 20106308D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Gaming
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102548D
+ − Impact Statements (5)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (15)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (61-Y 29-N)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (27-Y 13-N)
March 8, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 34-N)
March 8, 2020: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 8-N)
March 7, 2020: Senate requested second conference committee (32-Y 7-N)
March 7, 2020: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
February 26, 2020: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 3-N)
February 25, 2020: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
February 21, 2020: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 38-N)
February 18, 2020: Reported from General Laws with substitute (15-Y 5-N)
February 10, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
February 7, 2020: Substitute by Senator McPike agreed to (24-Y 13-N)
February 6, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
January 29, 2020: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Jeremy S. McPike
Type:
Primary Sponsor