+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104627D
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A)
January 24, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2018: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor