+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB382ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB382S1
- Substitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 18105337D-S1
- Floor substitute printed 18105337D-S1 (Chafin)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101341D
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 12, 2018: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor