+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 4/15/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB381ER)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
- Emergency clause added
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 4
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989155681-E
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 989155681
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 27, 1998: Reported from Education with amendment (24-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor