+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0574)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 574 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB380ER)
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N 4-A)
- Passed Senate (36-A 0-N 4-A)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB380S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 062765766-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
- Committee substitute printed 062765766-S1
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062650820
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N 2-A)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N 4-A)
February 13, 2006: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N 3-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor