+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Norment, Bell, Stuart
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on amendment
- Delegates: Bell, Batten, Torian
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (53-Y 45-N)
- VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (15-Y 3-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On December 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100570D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 10, 2022: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2022: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
March 8, 2022: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 45-N)
March 3, 2022: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (15-Y 3-N)
February 15, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2022: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2022: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor