+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0764)
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Bill became law, Chapter 764 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB379ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (24-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 983227661-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 983227661
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor