+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB378ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Passed House (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB378S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105225D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105225D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101361D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
February 27, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 1-N)
February 14, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
February 10, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor