+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0689)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 689 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 29, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 28, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB376ER)
On March 7, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed LD0204649 (SB376E)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed