+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0800)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 800 (effective 7/1/14)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB376ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB376ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB376S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104001D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 14104001D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103215D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 23, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
April 23, 2014: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 1-N)
February 28, 2014: House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2014: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor