+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 115 (effective 7/1/12)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0115)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB371ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB371S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104346D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12104346D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103380D
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2012: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor