+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 735 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB370ER)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: (1-Y 37-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (31-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (31-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Saslaw, Herring, Bell
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Delegates: Marshall, R.G., Nutter, Howell, A.T.
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 064789816-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB370H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health and Human Resources (Hamilton)
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 064789816-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 062010816-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB370E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062010816
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (11)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (1-Y 37-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (31-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2006: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor