+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB37E
- Printed as engrossed 18100592D-E
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100592D
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
January 25, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor