+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Left in Finance
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 082885220-S1
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On December 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082813220
+ − Vote
January 23, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor