+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 588 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0588)
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB368ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 18107508D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107508D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB368H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18107508D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103163D