+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0930)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 930 (effective 7/1/96)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB366ER)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (40-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 7, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964913761