+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
On April 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 30, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 29, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB365ER)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (96-Y 1-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 21, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD7202649 (SB365S2)
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD4323649 (SB365S1)
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N)
March 1, 1994: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (37-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
February 9, 1994: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor