+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0902)
- Reenrolled bill text (SB364ER2)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 902 (effective 7/1/06)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Reenrolled
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 0-N)
On April 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB364ER)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 067768836-S3
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (31-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (0-Y 37-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: (31-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Delegates: Hogan, Wardrup, Scott, J.M.
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senators: Wampler, Hawkins, Wagner
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB364H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 067752276-H1
- Read third time
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 067752276-H1
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #4 Prof./Occup./Admin. (Cosgrove)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB364S2
- Committee substitute agreed to 069203712-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 065361836-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 069203712-S2
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 065361836-S1
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069141836
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
April 19, 2006: VOTE: (37-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (0-Y 37-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (31-Y 0-N)
March 7, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2006: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2006: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor