+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Commerce and Labor
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106508D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB364S1
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Incorporates SB611 (Surovell)
- Committee substitute printed 18106508D-S1
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102045D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor