+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0521)
On April 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 521 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB364ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (24-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 983772857-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amd. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Dom. Relations/Juvenile
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 983772857