+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Continued to 2009 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081514348
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor