+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Senate sustained Governor's veto
On March 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
- Placed on Calendar
- Vetoed by Governor
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB363ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (59-Y 41-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (16-Y 7-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 985509727
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Labor and Commerce (16-Y 7-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor