+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB362ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Amendment by Senator Saslaw agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB362E
- Printed as engrossed 14102233D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102233D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2014: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 5, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor