+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0928)
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 928 (effective 7/1/96)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 17, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (95-Y 0-N)
On April 17, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 10, 1996 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1996 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 19, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled bill text (SB360ER)
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
- Passed House (76-Y 21-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 8-N)
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 15, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 961752722-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 12, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp. (39-Y 0-N), passed by for the day
On February 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 2-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On January 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 961752722
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: AGREE TO GOV'S RECOMM. (39-Y 0-N)
April 17, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 21-N)
March 5, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 8-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 1-N)
February 13, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds. (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor