+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 535 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0535)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB36ER)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107746D-H1
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107746D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB36H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107746D-H1
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 2-N)
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100250D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services