+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB36ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 2-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB36S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105160D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 12105160D-S1
- Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On December 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101135D
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 2-N)
February 13, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 9, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2012: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor