+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
On March 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 161 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB359ER)
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with amendments (95-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 021302524-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 021302524
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 22, 2002: Reported from C. C. T. with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 24, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2002: Reported from Local Government w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor