+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 619 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0619)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB359ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB359E
- Printed as engrossed 18101912D-E
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101912D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2018: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2018: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor