+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0151)
On March 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 151 (effective 3/2/08)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB357ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 084173348-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB357E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084173348
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2008: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2008: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2008: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor