+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 650 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0650)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB356ER)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101203D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2018: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor