+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0253)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 253 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB354ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102803D
+ − Votes (8)
February 26, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2016: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor