+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0254)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 254 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB354ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: #1 Standards of Quality
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 10102275D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB354E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102275D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 2, 2010: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2010: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2010: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor