+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB353ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB353E
- Printed as engrossed 18104260D-E
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104260D
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor