+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (23-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- No action taken by Appropriations by voice vote
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988365739-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988365739
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice