+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/08)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB352ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB352S2
- Substitute by Senator Stosch agreed to 082402332-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 082402332-S2 (Stosch)
- Committee substitute rejected 082392332-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 082392332-S1
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 082368332
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2008: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2008: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2008: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor