+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Continued to 2021 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104218D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Judiciary (12-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
L. Louise Lucas
Type:
Primary Sponsor