+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0690)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 690 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB352ER)
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (21-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 041703740
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from General Laws with amds (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2004: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor