+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0705)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 705 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB35ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Passed House with amendment (95-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
On December 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103055D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 1, 2012: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
February 28, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
February 23, 2012: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N)
February 22, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2012: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2012: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 3-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor