+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 1-N)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
On December 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100874D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 6, 2014: Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 1-N)
March 5, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (19-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2014: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 2-N)
January 17, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor