+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (55)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 748 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0748)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB349ER)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference substitute printed 18108199D-S2
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delegates: Landes, Bell, Richard P., VanValkenburg
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators: Peake, Newman, Lucas
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107336D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB349H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107336D-H1
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106277D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB349S1
- Emergency clause deleted
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106277D-S1
- Incorporates SB723 (Peake)
- Incorporates SB257 (Suetterlein)
- Incorporates SB409 (McDougle)
- Incorporates SB548 (Dunnavant)
- Incorporates SB549 (Dunnavant)
- Incorporates SB551 (Dunnavant)
- Incorporates SB558 (Dunnavant)
- Incorporates SB863 (Sturtevant)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/10/18 18102852D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (11)
March 10, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2018: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2018: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2018: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2018: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor