+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0591)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 591 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB349ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/14/04 046456740
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: Reported from Finance with amd (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2004: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor