+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On April 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB348ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (87-Y 0-N)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Conference substitute printed 064897744-S2
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (36-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
- Delegates: Hurt, Bell, Johnson
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Howell, Norment, Stolle
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (1-Y 39-N)
- House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N)
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 060042744-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB348H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 060042744-H1
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB348S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 064627744-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 064627744-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069817744
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2006: VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: (1-Y 39-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2006: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor