+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N)
- Defeated by House (38-Y 58-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Del. Watts agreed to
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by Trans. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024976512
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 7, 2002: VOTE: DEFEATED (38-Y 58-N)
March 4, 2002: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 9-N)
February 19, 2002: Referred from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N)
January 17, 2002: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by Trans. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor