+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 796 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022
- Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB345ER)
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (71-Y 27-N)
- Passed House (71-Y 27-N)
- Read third time
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
- Reported from Transportation (17-Y 5-N)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106157D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB345S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106157D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102694D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 27, 2022: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
March 7, 2022: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 27-N)
March 1, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
March 1, 2022: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 5-N)
February 10, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2022: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2022: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2022: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor