+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB344S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108014D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108014D-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102883D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Rules with substitute (11-Y 1-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Janet D. Howell
Type:
Primary Sponsor