+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Tabled in Commerce and Energy (12-Y 10-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB344E
- Printed as engrossed 22102485D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102485D