+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
On March 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB342ER)
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 025735408
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (100-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2002: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2002: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor