+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/18)
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB340ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 18103170D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB340E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103170D
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor