+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On May 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (39-Y 58-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (39-Y 58-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (41-Y 58-N)
- House rejected Gov's recommendation (41-Y 58-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (39-Y 1-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 1-N)
On April 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On April 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB340ER)
On March 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed LD4418733 (SB340S2)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1994 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by conference committee
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Delegates: Councill, Cranwell, Dillard
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senators: Schewel, Holland, E. M., Holland, C. A.
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- VOTE: ACCEDE TO REQ. FOR CONF (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1994 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 37-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED HOUSE SUBSTITUTE (2-Y 37-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read third time
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD5148204 (SB340H1)
- Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 1
On February 16, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 11, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD4369733 (SB340S1)
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented and ordered printed